U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Meza v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 19, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [Certificate]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extend]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Certificate]
  • December 12, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Certificate]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Certificate]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Certificate]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Certificate]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Certificate]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Certificate]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Certificate]
  • June 17, 2022: [Declaration]
  • June 17, 2022: [Brief]
  • June 17, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 15, 2022: [Reassignment Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • June 10, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • June 09, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • June 02, 2022: [Declaration]
  • June 02, 2022: [Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 12, 2022: [Brief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 12, 2022: [Extend]
  • May 10, 2022: [Declaration]
  • May 10, 2022: [Response]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 26, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • March 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.