U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03047
  • Case Name: Geddam Sathya Sairama et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Case Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • May 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Certificate]
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • March 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • March 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.