U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Bower Lightfeather v. Choctan Nation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Supplement]
  • May 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • May 02, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • March 23, 2022: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.