U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Frazier et al v. Meyers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Mandate/Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Copy of Order from USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Copy of Order from USCA]
  • August 08, 2022: [Returned Mail]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Copy of Order from USCA]
  • July 25, 2022: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 18, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.