U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00103
  • Case Name: McDade v. Employed Amin. Staff Individuals et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Returned Mail]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • May 25, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 19, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 04, 2022: [Prisoner/Non-Prisoner Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Letter by Clerk Requesting Trust Account Statement]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2022: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.