U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Mitteis et al v. Continental Western Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Disclosure Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • August 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
  • May 10, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - Consent]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - Consent]
  • April 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.