U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00149
  • Case Name: JGC Investments, LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Strike Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • May 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • May 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • April 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • April 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.