U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03071
  • Case Name: Williams v. Frakes et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 03, 2025: [Brief]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 06, 2024: [Extend]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Certificate]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extend]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extend]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Extend]
  • November 07, 2022: [Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 23, 2022: [Extend]
September, 2022
  • September 25, 2022: [Extend]
  • September 02, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 02, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Strike Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extend]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 29, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 22, 2022: [Extend]
  • July 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • July 21, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 18, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • July 15, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 15, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • June 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2022: [Summons Requested]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Reassignment Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • April 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.