U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Carroll v. Auman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • July 11, 2022: [Strike Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • April 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 29, 2022: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.