U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03073
  • Case Name: IRUNGU v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Case Dismissal]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extend]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • May 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • May 02, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • May 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.