U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Griffin v. Omaha Police Dept
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Supplement]
  • June 16, 2022: [Supplement]
  • June 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2022: [Supplement]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Supplement]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Supplement]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Prisoner/Non-Prisoner Statement]
  • May 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.