U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kesselberg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2022: [Proposed Exhibit List]
  • October 09, 2022: [Proposed Witness List]
  • October 09, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 09, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • October 09, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Trial Order]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Trial Order]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extend]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2022: [Audio File]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.