U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tockey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 14, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C) - SEALED]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reassignment Order]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2023: [Audio File]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Review]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 21, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • December 20, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • December 20, 2022: [Review]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • November 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • November 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • November 29, 2022: [Audio File]
  • November 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Conduct Plea Hearing by Remote Conference]
  • November 29, 2022: [CARES Act - Remote Pleas]
  • November 28, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • November 28, 2022: [Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • November 27, 2022: [Order]
  • November 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2022: [Audio File]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 03, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Audio File]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.