U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamzeh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Trial Order]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 14, 2022: [Extend]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Audio File]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.