U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dean
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [Trial Order]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Consent/Order Regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release (PS 42)]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Consent/Order Regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release (PS 42)]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extend]
  • June 16, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Audio File]
  • May 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 25, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.