U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Norman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • January 24, 2023: [Audio File]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • January 24, 2023: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • January 24, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 24, 2023: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • January 24, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Conduct Plea Hearing by Remote Conference]
  • January 24, 2023: [CARES Act - Remote Pleas]
  • January 10, 2023: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Audio File]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
November, 2022
  • November 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 18, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Audio File]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • May 25, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.