U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woolsoncroft
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Audio File]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.