U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • October 07, 2022: [Audio File]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
  • October 07, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • October 07, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release - SEALED]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 27, 2022: [Audio File]
  • May 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.