U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.