U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00257
  • Case Name: Committe v. John Does
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • November 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Reassignment Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 27, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extend]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • June 01, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.