U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Tentative Findings of Fact]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • December 23, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • December 23, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • October 14, 2022: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • October 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • October 13, 2022: [Audio File]
  • October 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Conduct Plea Hearing by Remote Conference]
  • September 12, 2022: [CARES Act - Remote Pleas]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 06, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 03, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.