U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Inda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • January 09, 2023: [Version of Offense]
  • January 04, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2023: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • January 04, 2023: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • January 04, 2023: [Audio File]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • January 04, 2023: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Trial Order]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Review]
  • August 18, 2022: [Review]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 28, 2022: [Extend]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 09, 2022: [Oral]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.