U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Jolivet v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • July 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 01, 2022: [Reassignment Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 10, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 10, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • June 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.