U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03104
  • Case Name: Stewart v. Department of Correctional Service Staff et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • August 15, 2022: [Prisoner Filing Fee Paid]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Response]
  • July 18, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order - Pro Se GO 2022-04]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • June 13, 2022: [Prisoner/Non-Prisoner Statement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 13, 2022: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.