U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kinney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 17, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.