U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 28, 2022: [Tentative Findings of Fact]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 23, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • August 25, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • August 25, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • August 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 24, 2022: [Audio File]
  • August 19, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Audio File]
  • August 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Waiver]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order - Text Only]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.