U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Platt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Email Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Email]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 21, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Audio File]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2022: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [Audio File]
  • August 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.