U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Supplement to USCA Record]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extend]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • October 27, 2022: [Audio File]
  • October 27, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Oral]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 12, 2022: [Suppress]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extend]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.