U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Avalos-Diaz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order/Judgment from USCA]
  • March 28, 2025: [Opinion of USCA]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Trial Order]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extend]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 29, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 23, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Oral]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.