U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez Zuniga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • August 24, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - Amended]
  • June 17, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Consular Notification]
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.