U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spence
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Trial Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2022: [Audio File]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • August 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.