U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cass
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 23, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 23, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • December 23, 2022: [Audio File]
  • December 23, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Response to Objection To Findings and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
  • October 03, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • September 06, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Response]
  • August 12, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 11, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 11, 2022: [Suppress]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extend]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 29, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 22, 2022: [Oral]
  • June 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.