U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Extend]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extend]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Bill of Particulars]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extend]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extend]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.