U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bernabe-Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • September 02, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • September 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • September 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Consular Notification]
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.