U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00136-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Nguyen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Audio File]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • December 14, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • December 14, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Trial Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2022: [Audio File]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 06, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 06, 2022: [Audio File]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Oral]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Rule 5 Pleadings - In]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.