U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Consent/Order Regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release (PS 42)]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 03, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Tentative Findings of Fact]
  • September 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 25, 2022: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2022: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • June 16, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • June 16, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Conduct Plea Hearing by Remote Conference]
  • June 16, 2022: [CARES Act - Remote Pleas]
  • June 16, 2022: [Waiver]
  • June 16, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 16, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.