U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Cobbs v. Buck's, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Stipulation for Dismissal]
  • January 20, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 04, 2023: [Settlement Order]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Mediation Reference Order]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • August 15, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 12, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 20, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • June 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.