U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Almustaqiim
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Consent/Order regarding Conditions of Release (Prob 12B)]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extend]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2023: [Consent/Order Regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release (PS 42)]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Audio File]
  • December 13, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • December 07, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2022: [Audio File]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • November 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 22, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • November 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • November 17, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Audio File]
  • November 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2022: [Audio File]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 30, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 29, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • August 25, 2022: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 25, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 15, 2022: [Strike Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 22, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.