U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamilton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 17, 2023: [Extend]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 25, 2022: [Extend]
  • November 25, 2022: [Strike]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extend]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 26, 2022: [Extend]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 25, 2022: [Extend]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extend]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 28, 2022: [Strike Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Oral]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.