U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Mandate/Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order/Judgment from USCA]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 24, 2023: [Audio File]
  • January 24, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Oral]
  • January 19, 2023: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 21, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • December 01, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • November 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • November 29, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • November 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2022: [Audio File]
  • November 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Conduct Plea Hearing by Remote Conference]
  • November 23, 2022: [CARES Act - Remote Pleas]
  • November 23, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Request for Transcript (Non-Party)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Request for Transcript (Non-Party)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • October 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 04, 2022: [Audio File]
  • October 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing Review]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Review]
  • October 04, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 03, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 03, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Review]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 29, 2022: [Extend]
  • September 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 20, 2022: [Audio File]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Review]
  • September 20, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • September 13, 2022: [Review]
  • September 13, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extend]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.