U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:05-cr-03095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kiser
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
  • August 25, 2022: [Reassignment Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 29, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
  • June 28, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Reassignment Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.