U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • January 05, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • January 05, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 19, 2022: [Trial Order]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Audio File - Restricted]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 27, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.