U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Earth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • December 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 19, 2022: [Audio File]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2022: [Audio File]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • August 03, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.