U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Wilkins v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Audio File]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Email Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Email]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 02, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice Regarding No Certificate of Compliance]
  • December 05, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • December 05, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • November 21, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • November 21, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Strike]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 21, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 26, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 17, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 17, 2022: [Strike]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 22, 2022: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2022: [Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • July 15, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 15, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • July 15, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
  • July 01, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • July 01, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.