U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Donahoe v. Esurance Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 05, 2025: [Attachment - Continued]
  • May 05, 2025: [Index]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply Brief]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 23, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (No Signature)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Index]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Index]
  • March 31, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • July 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.