U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clifton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 18, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Returned Mail]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Dismiss Defendant]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order of Detention]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • October 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 20, 2022: [Indictment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • July 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.