U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tosone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 29, 2025: [Consent/Order regarding Conditions of Release (Prob 12B)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Receipt (Other)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Audio File]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Dismiss Defendant]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Audio File]
  • August 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • August 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge in a Misdemeanor Case]
  • August 26, 2022: [Waiver]
  • August 26, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • August 26, 2022: [Information - Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.