U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hudson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 28, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • April 28, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 28, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • April 28, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Email Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Email]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 21, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extend]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 20, 2022: [Extend]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • September 27, 2022: [Audio File]
  • September 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 27, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.