U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03217
  • Case Name: NEBCO, Inc. v. Butler
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 11, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amend]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Objection]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response]
  • March 18, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extend]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • November 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 11, 2022: [Extend]
  • November 11, 2022: [Brief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Index]
  • November 07, 2022: [Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • October 21, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 21, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 14, 2022: [Index]
  • October 14, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order - Text Only]
  • October 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 30, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • September 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.