U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tyee et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 30, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 24, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 26, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 26, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 26, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Email Motion]
  • September 26, 2024: [Email]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Audio File]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 18, 2022: [Oral]
  • November 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 19, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • October 19, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • October 19, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.